EP3088454 - POLYOLEFIN RESIN FOAM PARTICLES, AND POLYOLEFIN RESIN IN-MOLD EXPANSION MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA Toru c/o Kaneka Corporation 5-1-1 Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
FUKUZAWA Jun c/o Kaneka Corporation 5-1-1 Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | [2023/35] |
Former [2016/44] | 01 /
YOSHIDA Toru c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1 Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 5660072 / JP | ||
02 /
FUKUZAWA Jun c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1 Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 14875628.1 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014JP83241 | Priority number, date | JP20130270943 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013270943 | [2016/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015098619 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088454 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3088454 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08J9/12, C08J9/16, C08J9/18, C08J9/232 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
B29C44/02 (US);
B29C44/3461 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08J9/122 (EP,US);
C08J9/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/232 (EP,US);
B29C44/348 (EP);
B29K2023/065 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/041 (EP);
B29K2105/048 (EP,US);
C08J2203/02 (EP,US);
C08J2205/044 (US);
C08J2205/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | C08J9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYOLEFINHARZSCHAUMTEILCHEN UND EXPANSIONSGEFORMTER GEGENSTAND AUS POLYOLEFINHARZ | [2023/32] | English: | POLYOLEFIN RESIN FOAM PARTICLES, AND POLYOLEFIN RESIN IN-MOLD EXPANSION MOLDED ARTICLE | [2016/44] | French: | PARTICULES DE MOUSSE DE RÉSINE DE POLYOLÉFINE, ET ARTICLE MOULÉ EXPANSÉ DANS LE MOULE DE RÉSINE DE POLYOLÉFINE | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/44] | POLYOLEFINHARZSCHAUMPARTIKEL UND EXPANSIONSGEFORMTER ARTIKEL AUS POLYOLEFINHARZ | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2016 | Translation filed | 27.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 18.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | LU | 16.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SI | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013231409 (FUKUZAWA JUN [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0101] * * examples 2,4-7 ** claim - * | International search | [A]JP2000063556 (JSP CORP); | [A]JP2006509051 (BASF AG.); | [X]JP2009167236 (KANEKA CORP); | [X]JP2010209145 (KANEKA CORP); | [X]JP2013100555 (KANEKA CORP); | [A]JP2013181157 (JSP CORP) | by applicant | JPS58210933 | JPS59207942 | JPH08113667 | WO2008139822 | JP2009114359 | JP2010248341 |