EP3089706 - APPARATUS AND METHOD TO RESHAPE GEOMETRY OF DISEASED HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitralshape Rue Louis de Geer 6 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2022/18] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Mitral Technologies Quai Banning 6 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states Tozzi, Luigi, P. 1019 Fossil Creek Parkway Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOZZI, Luigi P. 1019 Fossil Creek Parkway Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [2019/13] |
Former [2016/45] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Debled, Thierry Pecher & Partners Rue Louis de Geer, 6 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14875934.3 | 31.12.2014 | [2016/45] | WO2014US73084 | Priority number, date | US201461923319P | 03.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461923319 P | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015103434 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3089706 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/2445 (EP,US);
A61F2/246 (US);
A61F2/2451 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B2017/00243 (US);
A61F2/2454 (US);
A61F2/2466 (US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0004 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMFORMUNG DER GEOMETRIE EINER ERKRANKTEN HERZKLAPPE | [2016/45] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD TO RESHAPE GEOMETRY OF DISEASED HEART VALVE | [2016/45] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR REMODELER LA GÉOMÉTRIE D'UNE VALVE CARDIAQUE MALADE | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 26.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 15.02.2021 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2022/06] | 01.04.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2022/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005222488 (CHANG ROBERT T [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0129] , [ 132] - [0160]; figures 1-73 *; | [X]US2006020336 (LIDDICOAT JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0133] - [0141]; figures 34-55 *; | [X]US2008195126 (SOLEM JAN OTTO [CH]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0072]; figure 10B *; | [A]US2010016655 (ANNEST LON S [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2005004668 (AKLOG LISHAN [US], et al); | [A]US2006252984 (RAHDERT DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US2010222876 (HYDE GREGORY MATHEW [US]) | by applicant | US2005222488 | US2006020336 | US2008195126 |