EP3090025 - DYE, FILLER MADE THEREFROM, COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING THE FILLER, AND METHOD OF DETERMINING DEGREE OF CURE OF SUCH COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Mark F. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
WENDLAND, Michael S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/45] | Application number, filing date | 14876676.9 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/45] | WO2014US71683 | Priority number, date | US201361921644P | 30.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361921644 P | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015102966 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090025 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/08, C09B29/045, C09B29/08 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
C09C3/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/47 (US);
C08K7/20 (US);
C08K9/04 (US);
C09B29/0088 (US);
C09B29/0801 (EP,US);
C09B29/0813 (EP,US);
C09B29/0827 (EP,US);
C09B29/0829 (EP,US);
C09B69/008 (EP,US);
C09C1/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/45] | C09C3/08, C09B29/045 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Title | German: | FARBSTOFF, FÜLLSTOFF DARAUS, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DWM FÜLLSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES HÄRTUNGSGRADES DIESER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2016/45] | English: | DYE, FILLER MADE THEREFROM, COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING THE FILLER, AND METHOD OF DETERMINING DEGREE OF CURE OF SUCH COMPOSITIONS | [2016/45] | French: | COLORANT, CHARGE FABRIQUÉE À PARTIR DE CE COLORANT, COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT LA CHARGE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DU DEGRÉ DE DURCISSEMENT DE CES COMPOSITIONS | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 19.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5691081 ; | [X]JPS449758B (NN) [X] 15 * page 7, col. 1, compound on the top *; | [A]GB1435077 (YORKSHIRE CHEMICALS LTD) [A] 15* example - *; | [AD]US2006202158 (CHEN CHII-SHU [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * examples 2-5,21-23,35-60 *; | [XP]WO2014151708 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [XP] 15 * page 5; compound XI * * page 14 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 36, Database accession no. 1981-65294D, XP002771976 & JPS5691081 A 19810723 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [X] 15 * abstract * * page 4; compounds 2,5,28,29 * | International search | [Y] - TOWNS, A.D., "Developments in azo disperse dyes derived from heterocyclic diazo components", DYES AND PIGMENTS, 1999, (19990430), vol. 42, pages 3 - 28, XP004162723 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0143-7208(99)00005-4 | [Y] - SANCHEZ, C. ET AL., "Applications of advanced hybrid organic-inorganic nano materials: from laboratory to market", CHEM. SOC. REV., (20110228), vol. 40, pages 696 - 753, XP055028551 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0cs00136h | [A] - PETERS, A.T. ET AL., "Monoazo Disperse Dye derived from Nitro-2-amino- benzothiazoles", DYES AND PIGMENTS, (1995), vol. 28, pages 151 - 164, XP004033210 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0143-7208(95)00012-5 | [A] - PETERS, A.T. ET AL., "Diverse Dyes: 4-Hetarylazo Derivatives from N-beta- Cyanoethyl-N-beta-Hydroxyethylaniline", J. CHEM. TECH BIOTECHNOL., (1992), vol. 53, pages 301 - 308, XP000267180 | by applicant | JPS59120612 | US2006202158 |