EP3096319 - SPEECH PROCESSING METHOD AND SPEECH PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yulong Computer Telecommunication Scientific (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. No. 2 Mengxi Road North of Hightech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Changning 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14878656.9 | 15.01.2014 | [2016/47] | WO2014CN70641 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015106401 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096319 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/40, H04R3/00, G10L21/0264, G10L21/0216 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
G10L21/0264 (EP,US);
G10L21/0216 (US);
H04R1/406 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
H04R3/04 (US);
G10L2021/02166 (US);
H04R2430/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/47] | G10L21/0264 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Title | German: | SPRACHVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN SPRACHVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/47] | English: | SPEECH PROCESSING METHOD AND SPEECH PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2016/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PAROLE | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2016 | Translation filed | 08.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 03.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 11.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010128892 (CHEN SHAOHAI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7* paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0014] - [0020]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2013082875 (SORENSEN KARSTEN VANDBORG [SE]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0010] - [0019] - [0 30] - [0045]; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US2013332156 (TACKIN ONUR ERGIN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0028] - [0051]; figures 1,9-10 * [I] 4,9 | International search | [Y]CN102164328 (CHINESE ACAD INST ACOUSTICS); | [Y]CN102800325 (UNIV XIAMEN); | [A]JP2013201525 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]CN103366756 (LENOVO BEIJING LTD); | [X]US2013332156 (TACKIN ONUR ERGIN [US], et al) |