EP3091435 - RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TERMINAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Zhongkun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14878657.7 | 06.06.2014 | [2016/45] | WO2014CN79416 | Priority number, date | CN20141026010 | 20.01.2014 Original published format: CN201410026010 | [2016/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015106529 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091435 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G06F9/5016 (EP,US);
G06F9/5011 (US);
G06F9/44505 (US);
G06F3/0644 (US);
G06F8/60 (US);
G06F9/5077 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR ENDGERÄTESYSTEM | [2016/45] | English: | RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TERMINAL SYSTEM | [2016/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES POUR SYSTÈME DE TERMINAL | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2016 | Translation filed | 12.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 03.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007169084 (FRANK DAVIS W [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,12 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] *[I] 2,4,5,8-11 | International search | [A]CN1869931 (LG ELECTRONICS KUNSHAN COMP CO [CN]); | [Y]CN101371227 (PALM INC [US]); | [Y]CN101894042 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMM TECH); | [Y]CN102520983 (ZTE CORP); | [A]US8261231 (HIRSCH SCOTT [US], et al) |