EP3091707 - DATA PACKET PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON PARALLEL PROTOCOL STACK INSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Qiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEN, Liufei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14880886.8 | 20.11.2014 | [2016/45] | WO2014CN91727 | Priority number, date | CN2014143932 | 29.01.2014 Original published format: CN201410043932 | [2016/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015113437 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091707 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
H04L69/162 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L69/03 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENPAKETVERARBEITUNG AUF DER BASIS VON PARALLELEN PROTOKOLLSTAPELINSTANZEN | [2016/45] | English: | DATA PACKET PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON PARALLEL PROTOCOL STACK INSTANCES | [2016/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES ET DISPOSITIF BASÉ SUR DES INSTANCES DE PILES DE PROTOCOLES PARALLÈLES | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2016 | Translation filed | 03.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 17.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8230090 (FAN KAN FRANKIE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 61 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 16 *; | [A]EP1385313 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] * | [X] - GU QIANG ET AL, "StackPool: A High-Performance Scalable Network Architecture on Multi-core Servers", 2013 IEEE 10TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS & 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMBEDDED AND UBIQUITOUS COMPUTING, IEEE, (20131113), doi:10.1109/HPCC.AND.EUC.2013.13, pages 17 - 28, XP032606211 [X] 1-15 * Section III B. Architecture Overview Section III c 2) Virtual Lanes and Lane Selector Section III c 6) Other Design Considerations * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HPCC.and.EUC.2013.13 | International search | [A]CN201805555U (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN102769575 (NANJING ZTE SPECIAL SOFTWARE CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN102904729 (DAWNING INF IND BEIJING CO LTD) |