EP3099635 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTERRELATED CONTROL OF CHLORINATORS AND PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayward Industries, Inc. 400 Connell Drive, Suite 6100 Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | [2020/11] |
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states Hayward Industries, Inc. 620 Division Street Elizabeth, NJ 07201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURDOCK, James 118 Greenwood Drive Wakefield, RI 02879 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14880968.4 | 28.01.2014 | [2016/49] | WO2014US13390 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015116035 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3099635 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3099635 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/467, E04H4/12, // C02F103/42 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
C02F1/008 (EP,US);
C02F1/4674 (EP,US);
E04H4/1209 (EP,US);
E04H4/1281 (EP,US);
C02F2103/42 (EP,US);
C02F2201/002 (US);
C02F2201/005 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4612 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4615 (US);
C02F2209/003 (EP,US);
C02F2209/005 (EP,US);
C02F2209/006 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | C02F1/467 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDEN STEUERUNG VON CHLORDOSIERERN UND PUMPEN | [2016/49] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTERRELATED CONTROL OF CHLORINATORS AND PUMPS | [2016/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA COMMANDE INTERDÉPENDANTE DE CHLORATEURS ET DE POMPES | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 23.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.01.2021 | 20.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2014 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | GB | 28.01.2022 | IE | 28.01.2022 | LU | 28.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.01.2014 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 28.01.2022 | ||
IE | 28.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.01.2014 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 28.01.2022 | ||
IE | 28.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.01.2014 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 28.01.2022 | ||
IE | 28.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 28.01.2022 | ||
IE | 28.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 28.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 28.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 28.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 28.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5985155 (MAITLAND PETER [US]) [X] 1-5,12,13 * column 3, lines 5-8,29-32,43-53 * * column 5, lines 9-14,26-50 * * figures 1,2,6 * * claims 1,4,7 * [I] 6-11,14,15; | [A]WO2011143736 (GECKO ALLIANCE GROUP INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2011290707 (PORAT JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029] - [0080] , [0091] * * figure 1 *; | [X]AU2013100126 (ASTRAL POOL AUSTRALIA PTY LTD) [X] 1,12,13 * pages 4-7; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US2008237148 (DENNIS RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2010254825 (STILES JR ROBERT W [US], et al); | [X]US2011290707 (PORAT JOSEPH [US]) |