EP3107092 - CONTENT SELECTION DEVICE, AND CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONTENT SELECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlphaTheta Corporation 4-4-5, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0012 / JP | [2020/30] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states Pioneer DJ Corporation 4-4-5, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASHITA, Takashi c/o PIONEER CORPORATION 1-1 Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | 02 /
NITTA, Takafumi c/o PIONEER CORPORATION 1-1 Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 14882450.1 | 12.02.2014 | [2016/51] | WO2014JP00716 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015121889 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107092 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/031, G11B27/34, G10L19/00, G06F17/30 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP);
G06F16/60 (EP);
G11B27/031 (EP);
G10H2220/106 (EP);
G10H2240/131 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | G10L19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | INHALTSAUSWAHLVORRICHTUNG SOWIE STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM FÜR EINE INHALTSAUSWAHLVORRICHTUNG | [2016/51] | English: | CONTENT SELECTION DEVICE, AND CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONTENT SELECTION DEVICE | [2016/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION DE CONTENU ET PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DESTINÉS À UN DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION DE CONTENU | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2016 | Translation filed | 02.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/48] | 22.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP21189133.8 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008086379 (DION DOMINIQUE [CA], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0233] - [0234]; figure 26D *[I] 2-11; | [X] - Anonymous, "Rekordbox Ver.2.0.3 Operating Instructions", (20130204), URL: http://faq.pioneerdj.com/files/img/DRI1001R.pdf, (20170831), XP055402622 [X] 1-13 * pages 17,18 * | [XI] - Anonymous, "Couch Music Player for iPad review: Create and edit playlists quicker than ever", (20131016), URL: about:reader?url=https://web.archive.org/web/20131016171739/https://www.imore.com/couch-music-player-ipad-review-create-and-edit-playlists-quicker-ever, (20170830), XP055402540 [X] 1,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2-11 | International search | [A]JP2008287125 (SONY CORP) [A] 3 * , paragraph [0043] & US 2008/0295028 A1 & EP 2012225 A2 & CN 101312065 A *; | [XA] - "iPad]Couch Music Player: Jikkuri Ongaku o Tanoshimu Tameni Tsukurareta iPad-yo Player", (20130403), URL: http://www.appbank.net/ 2013/04/ 03 /ipad/571787.php, (20140418), XP055359129 [X] 1-6, 12, 13 [A] 7-11 | [A] - "iTunes11 Tsukaikata Playlist Sakusei", (20130222), URL: http://www.pc-memo.info/ itunesll/420, (20140418), XP055359130 [A] 1-13 |