EP3115630 - AUTOMATIC TURNOVER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hui Zhou Toneluck Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. No. 20, East Xinlian Road Shuikou Subdistrict Office Huicheng District Huizhou City 516005 Guandong / CN | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Fang c/o Hui Zhou Toneluck Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. No. 20, Xinlian Road Shuikou Subdustrict Office Huicheng District Huizhou City Guangdong 516005 / CN | 02 /
PATRICK, Ng c/o Hui Zhou Toneluck Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. No. 20, Xinlian Road Shuikou Subdustrict Office Huicheng District Huizhou City Guangdong 516005 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Xiaodong c/o Hui Zhou Toneluck Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. No. 20, Xinlian Road Shuikou Subdustrict Office Huicheng District Huizhou City Guangdong 516005 / CN | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14883674.5 | 15.08.2014 | [2017/02] | WO2014CN84536 | Priority number, date | CN20141069989 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: CN201410069989 | [2017/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015127766 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3115630 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/12, A47K13/12, E05F15/614, E05F1/10, E05F1/12 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
E05F1/1215 (EP,US);
F16C11/12 (KR);
E05F15/616 (US);
A47K13/12 (KR);
E05F1/1016 (KR);
E05F15/614 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2201/416 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2201/426 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/484 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2400/30 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/44 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/236 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | F16C11/12, A47K13/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE UMDREHVORRICHTUNG | [2017/02] | English: | AUTOMATIC TURNOVER DEVICE | [2017/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETOURNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2016 | Translation filed | 20.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 20.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 20.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004100745 (WATT GLENN MICHAEL [NZ], et al); | [XI]US2010083431 (HALLETT MICHAEL JOHN [AU]); | [A]DE102011011829 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) | International search | [A]CN2506599Y (STATE RUN NO 4192 FACTORY [CN]); | [A]KR20030064317 ; | [A]CN201120297Y (DONGGUAN BONSEN ELECTRONICS CO [CN]); | [X]CN102197973 (JIANGMEN IDEAR HANYU ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD); | [PX]CN103807286 (HUIZHOU TONELUCK ELECTRO MECHANICS CO LTD); | [PX]CN203685842U (TONELUCK HUIZHOU ELECTRONICS IND CO LTD) |