EP3200433 - IPV6 ADDRESS MANAGEMENT METHOD, DEVICE AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Jian c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
FAN, Liang c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Chengxu c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
YUAN, Bo c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 14884580.3 | 24.11.2014 | [2017/31] | WO2014CN92087 | Priority number, date | CN201410495296 | 24.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410495296 | [2017/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015131567 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200433 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, H04L29/06 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H04L61/35 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L61/5053 (EP,US);
H04L61/5076 (EP,US);
H04L2101/659 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄT ZUR VERWALTUNG VON IPV6-ADRESSEN | [2017/31] | English: | IPV6 ADDRESS MANAGEMENT METHOD, DEVICE AND TERMINAL | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'ADRESSES IPV6, DISPOSITIF, ET TERMINAL | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2017 | Translation filed | 15.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 15.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012072605 (XU GANG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018] , [0020] , [0029] , [0030] , [0035] *; | [I] - SIFALAKIS M ET AL, "Network address hopping a mechanism to enhance data protection for packet communications", COMMUNICATIONS, 2005. ICC 2005. 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEOUL, KOREA 16-20 MAY 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050516), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICC.2005.1494598, ISBN 978-0-7803-8938-0, pages 1518 - 1523, XP010825538 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2005.1494598 | International search | [A]CN101854619 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102572790 (UNIV SUN YAT SEN) [A] 1-18 * , abstract, and description, paragraphs [0044]-[0059] *; | [A]US2013089097 (FILSFILS CLARENCE [BE], et al) [A] 1-18* , the whole document * |