EP3114577 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURED INFORMATION STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies OY Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONNI, Eki Petteri Kiveliönrinne 5 FI-02330 Espoo / FI | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 14884794.0 | 04.03.2014 | [2017/02] | WO2014FI50156 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015132446 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3114577 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F21/60 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
G06F21/6227 (EP,US);
G06F16/2468 (US);
G06F16/144 (EP,US);
G06F16/148 (EP,US);
G06F16/156 (EP,US);
G06F16/2453 (EP,US);
G06F16/835 (EP,US);
G06F16/8365 (EP,US);
G06F16/955 (EP,US);
G06N5/01 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GESICHERTEN INFORMATIONSSPEICHERUNG | [2017/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURED INFORMATION STORAGE | [2017/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE STOCKAGE D'INFORMATIONS SÉCURISÉ | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 12.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012078914 (ROEDER THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]WO2013124520 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 27 * * page 12, line 21 - page 14, line 32 ** page 55, line 32 - page 56, line 16 *; | [X] - Mohammad Saiful Islam ET AL, "Access Pattern disclosure on Searchable Encryption: Ramification, Attack and Mitigation", (20120207), URL: https://www.internetsociety.org/sites/default/files/06_1.pdf, (20170911), XP055405552 [X] 1-15 * page 4, column left, paragraph 2 * * page 10, column left, paragraph 3 - column right, paragraph 1 * * page 4, column left, paragraph 3 * * page 12, column left, paragraph 1 * * Section 9.1.3; page 9, column left * | [A] - MAGNUS SAHLGREN, "An Introduction to Random Indexing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE METHODS AND APPLICATIONS OF SEMANTIC INDEXING WORKSHOP AT THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TERMINOLOGY AND KNOWLEDGE ENGINEERING, Copenhagen, (20050816), XP055220203 [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * | International search | [X]US2012078914 (ROEDER THOMAS M [US], et al) [X] 1, 5, 7-8, 11-20 * pars. 0041-0042, 0054-0057; Figs. 2, 5 *; | [X]US2012159180 (CHASE MELISSA E [US], et al) [X] 1, 6-8, 10-11, 14-20 * pars. 0019-0024, 0044, 0047; Fig. 4 *; | [A]WO2013124520 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-20* page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 27; page 12, line 21 - page 14, line 32; page 55, line 32 - page 56, line 16 * |