EP3200092 - METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR IMPLEMENTING IMAGE SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Shiqin c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LU, Xiazi c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Junfeng c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
HU, Xiaoyu c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14884986.2 | 26.11.2014 | [2017/31] | WO2014CN92288 | Priority number, date | CN201410487831 | 22.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410487831 | [2017/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015131571 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200092 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G06F16/5866 (EP,US);
G06F16/436 (EP,US);
G06F16/54 (US);
G06V40/168 (US);
G06V40/193 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄT ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON BILDSEQUENZIERUNG | [2017/31] | English: | METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR IMPLEMENTING IMAGE SEQUENCING | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN SÉQUENÇAGE D'IMAGE | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2017 | Translation filed | 20.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 20.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013054622 (KARMARKAR AMIT V [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * [I] 1-8; | [A] - STARKER I ET AL, "A GAZE-RESPONSIVE SELF-DISCLOSING DISPLAY", HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, READING, US, (199004), pages 3 - 9, XP002068006 [A] 1,4,7,8 * page 5, column r - page 7 * | International search | [A]CN101382939 (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]) [A] 1-8 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102915193 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [A] 1-8 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103019917 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [A] 1-8* , the whole document * |