EP3108873 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND PREPARING PEARL EXTRACT FROM PEARLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osmun Biological Co., Ltd. No.99 Zhenzhu Rd. Mogan Shan High-tech Zone Huzhou Zhejiang 313200 / CN | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Anquan 518 Zhongxing North Road Wukang Town Deqing County Huzhou Zhejiang 313200 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jing 518 Zhongxing North Road Wukang Town Deqing County Huzhou Zhejiang 313200 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Lihua 518 Zhongxing North Road Wukang Town Deqing County Huzhou Zhejiang 313200 / CN | 04 /
LUO, Jianfen 518 Zhongxing North Road Wukang Town Deqing County Huzhou Zhejiang 313200 / CN | 05 /
XIE, Min 518 Zhongxing North Road Wukang Town Deqing County Huzhou Zhejiang 313200 / CN | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 14885101.7 | 04.12.2014 | [2016/52] | WO2014CN93042 | Priority number, date | CN20141097089 | 14.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410097089 | [2016/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015135346 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108873 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3108873 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/98, A61Q19/02, A61K8/64, A61K8/19 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
A61Q19/02 (EP,KR);
A61K8/19 (EP,KR);
A61K8/64 (EP,KR);
A61K8/987 (EP,KR);
A61P17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG UND HERSTELLUNG VON PERLENEXTRAKTEN AUS PERLEN | [2016/52] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND PREPARING PEARL EXTRACT FROM PEARLS | [2016/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION ET DE PRÉPARATION D'EXTRAIT DE PERLES À PARTIR DE PERLES | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2016 | Translation filed | 23.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 23.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2014 | AL | 21.06.2017 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | IE | 04.12.2017 | LU | 04.12.2017 | MT | 04.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1152439 (BIAN CHUNQI [CN]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]CN103333222 ; | [A]CN102018727 ; | [A]CN101100689 ; | [A]CN1425388 ; | [A]CN103446185 ; | [A]CN101720917 ; | [A]CN101357141 ; | [A]CN1086713 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 19, Database accession no. 2013-W87810, XP002763153 & CN103333222 A 20131002 (ZHEJIANG PHOENIX BIRD PEARL BIOLOGICAL) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 46, Database accession no. 2011-G01712, XP002763154 & CN102018727 A 20110420 (GUILIN LAYN NATURAL INGREDIENTS CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 37, Database accession no. 2008-F55640, XP002763155 & CN101100689 A 20080109 (HAINAN JINGRUN PEARL BIOLOGICAL TECHNOLO) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 11, Database accession no. 2004-099612, XP002763156 & CN1425388 A 20030625 (OUSHIMAN IND CO LTD ZHEJIANG) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 19, Database accession no. 2014-D29407, XP002763157 & CN103446185 A 20131218 (BEIHAI YUANLONG PEARL CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 46, Database accession no. 2010-H35951, XP002763158 & CN101720917 A 20100609 (WU W) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 19, Database accession no. 2009-F26547, XP002763159 & CN101357141 A 20090204 (HUNAN JINZHU BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 30, Database accession no. 1995-224721, XP002763160 & CN1086713 A 19940518 (BAOQING NUTRITIOUS PREPARATION FACTORY) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]CN1152439 (BIAN CHUNQI [CN]) [Y] 1-6 * see claim 1 *; | [Y]CN103333222 (ZHEJIANG CHANGSHENGNIAO PEARL BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * see claim 2 * |