EP3117681 - ESTABLISHMENT OF SECURE CONNECTIONS BETWEEN RADIO ACCESS NODES OF A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARONIUS, Joachim Milds Gata 6 S-586 63 Linköping / SE | 02 /
GUSTAFSSON, Mats Rist Stockhult S-590 75 Ljungsbro / SE | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 14885439.1 | 13.03.2014 | [2017/03] | WO2014SE50306 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015137855 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3117681 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, H04L9/00, H04W12/02, H04L29/06, H04W92/20 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
H04L63/164 (EP,US);
H04W76/12 (US);
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W72/27 (US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L63/0435 (EP,US);
H04L69/326 (US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (US);
H04W88/08 (US);
H04W88/16 (US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG VON SICHEREN VERBINDUNGEN ZWISCHEN FUNKZUGRIFFSKNOTEN EINES DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKS | [2017/03] | English: | ESTABLISHMENT OF SECURE CONNECTIONS BETWEEN RADIO ACCESS NODES OF A WIRELESS NETWORK | [2017/03] | French: | ÉTABLISSEMENT DE CONNEXIONS SÉCURISÉES ENTRE LES N UDS D'ACCÈS RADIO D'UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 24.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007058644 (BRAHMBHATT DEEPALI A [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract ** paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0018] *; | [XI]US2008305772 (BALASUBRAMANIAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13,18,19 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017] * [I] 2-10,14-17; | [XI]WO2010052169 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,11-13,18,19 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 4, line 11 - page 7, line 25 * [I] 2-10,14-17; | [A]WO2011053040 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * claims 1-12 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0087] * | International search | [A]WO02078290 (SSH COMM SECURITY OYJ [FI], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract *; | [A]US2004148430 (NARAYANAN RAM GOPAL LAKSHMI [US]) [A] 1-19* ; abstract *; | [A]US2006253701 (KIM SUN-GI [KR], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract *; | [A]US2007058644 (BRAHMBHATT DEEPALI A [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract * |