EP3119297 - ORTHOPEDIC STIFFENING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Empire Technology Development LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZDIL, Deniz 28 Chestnut Road Auburn, New South Wales 2144 / AU | 02 /
MARATHAKIS, Phillip 4 Cornwallis Street Unit 212A Eveleigh NSW, 2015 / AU | 03 /
ROGER, Gregory, James PO Box 964 Crows Nest, NSW 1585 / AU | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/22] | 01 /
OZDIL, Deniz 4 Cornwallis Street Unit 212a Eveleigh Nsw, 2015 / AU | ||
02 /
MARATHAKIS, Phillip 4 Cornwallis Street Unit 212A Eveleigh NSW, 2015 / AU | |||
03 /
ROGER, Gregory, James PO Box 964 Crows Nest, NSW 1585 / AU | |||
Former [2017/04] | 01 /
OZDIL, Deniz 4 Cornwallis Street Unit 212a Eveleigh Nsw, 2015 / AU | ||
02 /
MARATHAKIS, Phillip 4 Cornwallis Street Unit 212A Eveleigh NSW, 2015 / AU | |||
03 /
ROGER, Gregory, James 4 Cornwallis Street Unit 212A Eveleigh NSW, 2015 / AU | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 14886619.7 | 18.03.2014 | [2017/04] | WO2014US31037 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142320 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119297 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
A61B17/7049 (EP,US);
A61B17/701 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/7052 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | ORTHOPÄDISCHE VERSTEIFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/04] | English: | ORTHOPEDIC STIFFENING DEVICE | [2017/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RAIDISSEMENT ORTHOPÉDIQUE | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 18.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006200130 (HAWKINS NATHANIEL E [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [XI]US2010217322 (PREDICK DANIEL [US]) [X] 1-5,9-15,18-21 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1, 3, 4, 8-13 * [I] 6; | [XI]US2012035659 (BARRUS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,3,13-16 * the whole document * [I] 2 | International search | [Y]US6402751 (HOECK JAMES VAN [US], et al) [Y] 30 * entire document *; | [XY]US2012035659 (BARRUS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,17-20,29,31,37-39 * entire document * [Y] 30, 46; | [Y]US2014020333 (KNIGHT ADAM T [US], et al) [Y] 46* entire document * |