EP3125604 - LOAD INFORMATION TRANSFER METHOD, NETWORK ELEMENTS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/05] | LOAD INFORMATION TRANSFER METHOD, SYSTEM, NETWORK ELEMENTS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
[2022/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong Province 518057 / CN | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Bo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Li ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Feng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2022/34] |
Former [2017/05] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14886857.3 | 19.05.2014 | [2017/05] | WO2014CN77832 | Priority number, date | CN201410116845 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410116845 | [2017/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015143763 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125604 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3125604 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/12, H04W48/18, H04L67/303, // H04W28/08, H04W92/20, H04L47/12 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04W28/12 (EP,US);
H04W28/0284 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04W36/22 (US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04L47/12 (US);
H04W28/0865 (EP);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/08 (US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | H04W28/12, H04W48/20, // H04W92/20, H04L12/801 | ||
Former IPC [2017/05] | H04W28/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAST INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, NETZWERKELEMENTE UND COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/14] | English: | LOAD INFORMATION TRANSFER METHOD, NETWORK ELEMENTS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT D'INFORMATIONS DE CHARGE, ÉLÉMENTS DE RÉSEAU ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE | [2022/14] |
Former [2017/05] | LAST INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, SYSTEM, NETZWERKELEMENTE UND COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | ||
Former [2017/05] | LOAD INFORMATION TRANSFER METHOD, SYSTEM, NETWORK ELEMENTS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2017/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT D'INFORMATIONS DE CHARGE, SYSTÈME, ÉLÉMENTS DE RÉSEAU ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2016 | Translation filed | 25.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 25.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | IT | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | IE | 19.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014026324 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,12,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] *[I] 3,4,8,10,11,14 | International search | [X]CN101959241 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-22 * description, paragraphs [0072] to [0091], and figures 5 and 6 *; | [X]CN102131237 (TELECOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY RES INST) [X] 1-22 * description, paragraphs [0035] to [0037], and figure 4 *; | [X]CN102572950 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP DESIGN INST) [X] 1-22* description, paragraphs [0046] to [0058], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]CN103517337 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-22 * description, paragraphs [0027] to [0035], and figures 1 to 3 * | Examination | CN102131237 | US2013163463 | CN103517337 |