EP3127819 - TRIPOD HEAD DRIVING DEVICE AND TRIPOD HEAD ASSEMBLY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SZ DJI Osmo Technology Co., Ltd. 12th Floor, West Wing, Skyworth Semiconductor Design Building, No. 18 Gaoxin South 4th Ave Nanshan District, Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/34] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. 6/F Hkust SZ IER Bldg. 9, Yuexing 1st Road Hi Tech Park (south) Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yong 6/F HKUST SZ IER Bldg. 9 Yuexing 1st Rd Hi-tech Park (South) Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/24] |
Former [2017/06] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14888293.9 | 04.04.2014 | [2017/06] | WO2014CN74855 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015149370 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127819 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3127819 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64D47/08, F16M11/06, G03B17/56, F16M11/18 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
G03B17/561 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (US);
F16M11/10 (EP,US);
F16M11/123 (US);
F16M11/18 (EP,US);
F16M11/2028 (EP,US);
F16M13/02 (US);
F16M13/04 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
F16M2200/041 (EP,US);
F16M2200/044 (EP,US);
F16M2200/06 (US);
G03B2205/0023 (US);
G03B2205/0069 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | B64D47/08, F16M11/06, G03B17/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STATIVKOPFANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG UND STATIVKOPFANORDNUNG DAMIT | [2017/06] | English: | TRIPOD HEAD DRIVING DEVICE AND TRIPOD HEAD ASSEMBLY USING SAME | [2017/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE TÊTE TRIPODE ET ENSEMBLE TÊTE TRIPODE L'UTILISANT | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2016 | Translation filed | 25.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2022 | AT | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | ES | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | IT | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | NL | 15.06.2022 | PL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006329215 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,9,10* figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2010067180 (ORIGUCHI YOHTA [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * figures 12-14 *; | [X]CN202647108U (SHENZHEN DJI INNOVATIONS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]CN203131382U (SHENZHEN DAJIANG INNOVATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-11 * | International search | [A]US4979709 (ISHIKAWA MASAO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN201380965Y (INST AGRI RESOURCES CAAS) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN202295294U (SHENZHEN DAJIANG INNOVATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103277640 (BAODING VICTORY ELECTRO OPTIC SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [E]CN203927268U (SHENZHEN DAJIANG INNOVATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [E] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0023]-[0025] and figures 1-5 * |