EP3119029 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jinnan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Chao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 14888607.0 | 08.04.2014 | [2017/03] | WO2014CN74906 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015154223 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119029 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14, H04W16/10, // H04W72/08 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04B1/50 (US);
H04L5/0096 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04L5/1461 (EP,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP,US);
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/541 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | H04W16/10, H04L5/14 | ||
Former IPC [2017/03] | H04L5/14, H04B1/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/03] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2017/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2016 | Translation filed | 11.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 11.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013091187 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2013194984 (CHENG HONG [CN], et al); | [A]CN103458420 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | EP2858398 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [X]WO2013091187 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al); | [X]CN103209415 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN103458420 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |