EP3130251 - TUBULAR CONTAINER HAVING APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yonwoo Co., Ltd Gajwa-dong 13 Gajwa-ro 84beon-gil Seo-gu Incheon 404-250 / KR | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sung-Sin (Gajwa-dong) 13 Gajwa-ro 84beon-gil Seo-gu Incheon 404-250 / KR | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 14888771.4 | 01.10.2014 | [2017/07] | WO2014KR09257 | Priority number, date | KR20140043750 | 11.04.2014 Original published format: KR 20140043750 | [2017/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015156460 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3130251 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/26, B65D35/36, B65D47/20 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
B65D47/44 (EP,KR,US);
B65D47/2075 (EP,KR,US);
A45D34/04 (KR,US);
A45D40/26 (KR,US);
B65D47/42 (KR,US);
A45D2200/1009 (KR,US);
A45D2200/1018 (KR,US);
A45D2200/155 (EP,KR,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,KR,US);
B65D2251/0087 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | A45D40/26, B65D35/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | ROHRFÖRMIGER BEHÄLTER MIT APPLIKATOR | [2017/07] | English: | TUBULAR CONTAINER HAVING APPLICATOR | [2017/07] | French: | RÉCIPIENT TUBULAIRE AYANT UN APPLICATEUR | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | Translation filed | 11.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 06.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO0025627 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [Y] 2-4,7,8,10 * page 4, line 18 - page 7, line 8; figure - * [A] 1,5,6; | [XA]US2004112920 (FELTEN BERNHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 * [A] 2-10; | [Y]KR20060043570 (SCHWAN STABILO COSMETICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4* the whole document *; | [YA]WO2012102427 (SHIN KI BONG [KR]) [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-10; | [XY]KR20130103870 (YONWOO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5,6,9 * figures 1,5,6 * [Y] 2-4,7,8,10 | International search | [Y]KR20130103870 (YONWOO CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0016]-[0047], claims 1-11, figures 1-6. *; | [Y]WO2012102427 (SHIN KI BONG [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0031]-[0036], claim 1, figures 2-3. *; | [YA]KR20060043570 (SCHWAN STABILO COSMETICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4 * See abstract, paragraphs [0006]-[0024], claim 1, figure 1. * [A] 1-3, 5-10; | [A]KR20090021332 (COSMOGEN [FR]) [A] 1-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0081]-[0086], claim 1, figure 1. * |