EP3249289 - GENERAL-PURPOSE LED LAMP WITH CAST HOUSING/RADIATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sokolov, Yuriy Borisovich ul. Tsentralnaya 10A-55 Fryazino Moskovskaya obl. 141195 / RU | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULENKOV, Igor Viktorovich ul. Novogireevskaya 16-2-20 Moscow 111401 / RU | 02 /
GORBANEV, Andrey Yurevich Institutskaya 30-18 Moscow region Shchelkovo-3 141103 / RU | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte PartG mbB Magirus-Deutz-Straße 12 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte Küfergasse 11 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 14891555.6 | 26.12.2014 | [2017/48] | WO2014RU00997 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015171014 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | RU | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249289 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 12.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F21K9/237, F21V29/70, F21V29/87, // F21K9/238, F21Y115/10 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
F21V19/00 (RU);
F21K9/64 (US);
F21K9/232 (US);
F21K9/237 (EP,US);
F21K9/238 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/48] | F21V19/00, F21V29/70, F21Y101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | ALLZWECK-LED-LAMPE MIT GUSSGEHÄUSE/KÜHLER | [2017/48] | English: | GENERAL-PURPOSE LED LAMP WITH CAST HOUSING/RADIATOR | [2017/48] | French: | LAMPE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES À VOCATION GÉNÉRALE AVEC CORPS-RADIATEUR COULÉ | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2017 | Translation filed | 10.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 14.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]TWM433515U (YONG MEI HAO CO LTD [TW]) | International search | [DA]TW201405067 (KENNER MATERIAL & SYSTEM CO LTD [TW]); | [DA]CN203477931U (LEI AO); | [A]RU2516228 (OOO SVETOZAR [RU]); | [A]RU144430U |