EP3152700 - FINGERPRINT SENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secugen Corporation 2065 Martin Avenue Suite 108 Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Dong Won 3716 Rhoda Drive San Jose, California 95117 / US | 02 /
AHN, Winnie 345 Sheridan Avenue Apt. 207 Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
KIM, Jae Ho 6731 Worthing Court San Jose, California 95120 / US | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2017/15] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14893840.0 | 04.12.2014 | [2017/15] | WO2014US68646 | Priority number, date | US201462008242P | 05.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462008242 P | US201414463062 | 19.08.2014 Original published format: US201414463062 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015187197 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3152700 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3152700 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/13 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G06V40/1318 (EP,KR,US);
G06V40/1394 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/15] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCKMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/15] | English: | FINGERPRINT SENSING APPARATUS | [2017/15] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES | [2017/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 22.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2023 | 04.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2023 | 06.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5929845 (WEI CHENGPING [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US7859526 (KONICEK JEFFREY C [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,12,14,15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 15-18 * * column2, lines 61-67 * * column 3, lines 44-48 * * column 8, lines 48-67 * * column 9, lines 18-25 * * column 10, lines 10-18 and 32-51 * * column 11, lines 7-25 * * figure 4 * [I] 6,13 | International search | [Y]US6469289 (SCOTT-THOMAS JOHN [CA], et al) [Y] 7-8 and 19-20 * , entire document, especially Abstract; col 4, In 30 to co 5, In 15; col 7, In 35 to col 8, In 40 *; | [A]US2004252867 (LAN JE-HSIUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-23* , entire document *; | [A]US7289649 (WALLEY THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * , entire document *; | [XYA]US2009028396 (KISHIMA KOICHIRO [JP]) [X] 1, 8-9, 11-12, 14 and 22- * , entire document, especially Abstract; Figs. 11-12; Para [0011], [0043]-[0045], [0046]-[0048] * [Y] 10 and 21 [A] 2-4, 13 and 15-16; | [Y]US2011235871 (BYREN ROBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 10 and 21 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Para [0032], [0021], [0044]-[0048] *; | [XYA]US2014036168 (LUDWIG LESTER F [US]) [X] 1, 5-6, 12, 17-18 and 23 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Fig. 38-40; para [0169]-[0171], [0216]-[0217] * [Y] 7-8 and 19-20 [A] 2-4, 13 and 15-16 |