EP3163465 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA MINING BASED ON USER'S SEARCH BEHAVIOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Haidian District 100085 Beijing / CN | [2020/10] |
Former [2017/18] | For all designated states Beijing Baidupay Science And Technology Co., Ltd. 5Th Floor, Building B Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Cheng 5Th Floor Building B Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Jun 5Th Floor Building B Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
JIA, Yunfei 5Th Floor Building B Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Chi 5Th Floor Building B Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 14895487.8 | 25.06.2014 | [2017/18] | WO2014CN80757 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015196397 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163465 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q30/02, G06Q40/02 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06F16/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/2457 (EP,US);
G06F16/2465 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENAUSWERTUNG AUF DER BASIS DES SUCHVERHALTENS VON BENUTZERN | [2017/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA MINING BASED ON USER'S SEARCH BEHAVIOUR | [2017/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EXPLOITATION DE DONNÉES SUR LA BASE D'UN COMPORTEMENT DE RECHERCHE D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | Translation filed | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 29.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/45] | 30.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2021 | 07.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6981040 (KONIG YOCHAI [US], et al) [I] 8-15* col. 3, lines 38-44; col. 4, lines 20-22; col. 10, lines 5-17; col. 16, lines 50-60; *; | [I]US2008281808 (ANDERSON BLAKE EDWARD [US], et al) [I] 1-7,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0057] *; | [A] - SHATLYK ASHYRALYYEV ET AL, "Incorporating the surfing behavior of web users into pagerank", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION & KNOWLEDGE MANAGEMENT, CIKM '13, New York, New York, USA, (20130131), doi:10.1145/2505515.2505668, ISBN 978-1-4503-2263-8, pages 2351 - 2356, XP055416286 [A] 1-7,12,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2505515.2505668 | International search | [A]CN1967579 (UNIV HUNAN [CN]) [A] 1-28* , see the whole document *; | [X]CN102063453 (BAIDU ON LINE NETWORK TECH BJ) [X] 1-7, 14-20, 27-28 * , see description, [0037]-[0061], and figure 1 *; | [A]CN103399883 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [A] 1-28 * , see the whole document *; | [X]CN103473354 (FOCUS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 8-13, 21-28 * . see description, paragraphs [0031]-[0059], and figures 2-5 *; | [X]CN103778553 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1-28 * , see description, paragraphs [0024]-[0044], and figure 1 * |