EP3151498 - FBMC-BASED PILOT SENDING METHOD, CHANNEL ESTIMATING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Guangmei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Hua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
MIN, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 14896060.2 | 26.06.2014 | [2017/14] | WO2014CN80808 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015196408 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3151498 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3151498 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
H04L27/2654 (EP,US);
H04L25/0202 (US);
H04L27/26 (EP,US);
H04L27/261 (EP,US);
H04L27/26416 (EP,US);
H04L5/0005 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FBMC-BASIERTES PILOTSENDEVERFAHREN, KANALSCHÄTZUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/14] | English: | FBMC-BASED PILOT SENDING METHOD, CHANNEL ESTIMATING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICES | [2017/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI DE PILOTE BASÉ FBMC, PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE CANAL, ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2016 | Translation filed | 19.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 19.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2014 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | IE | 26.06.2020 | LU | 26.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | FR | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008007019 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [A] 5-11,15,16 * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 4 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 9 * * page 14, line 15 - page 15, line 8 * * figure 2a * * figure 2b * * page 19, line 24 - line 28 ** page 20, line 20 - page 21, line 10 *; | [I] - FRANCE TELECOM ET AL, "Some practical aspects for OFDM/OQAM channel estimation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-051458, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20051031), vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20051031, XP050101048 [I] 1-4,12-14,17 * paragraph [0002] * | [I] - LELE C ET AL, "Channel estimation with scattered pilots in OFDM/OQAM", SIGNAL PROCESSING ADVANCES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, 2008. SPAWC 2008. IEEE 9TH WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080706), ISBN 978-1-4244-2045-2, pages 286 - 290, XP031345948 [I] 1-4,12-14,17 * page 288, column l * | [I] - KLIKS ADRIAN ET AL, "Power loading for FBMC systems: An analysis with mercury-filling approach", ICT 2013, IEEE, (20130506), doi:10.1109/ICTEL.2013.6632152, pages 1 - 5, XP032777909 [I] 1-4,12-14,17 * paragraph [00IV] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTEL.2013.6632152 | [I] - TAEWOONG YOON ET AL, "Pilot Structure for High Data Rate in OFDM/OQAM-IOTA System", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2008. VTC 2008-FALL. IEEE 68TH, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080921), ISBN 978-1-4244-1721-6, pages 1 - 5, XP031352410 [I] 1-4,12-14,17 * paragraph [00IV] * | International search | [A]CN101877689 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-65 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO2013121958 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-65 * , abstract, description, paragraphs [0028]-[0053], and figures 3-7 *; | [A]CN103368889 (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL) [A] 1-65 * , description, paragraphs [0039]-[0052], and figures 5 and 8 *; | [A]EP2713542 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-65* , the whole document * |