EP3169304 - SPRAYABLE SUNSCREEN COMPOSITION WITH OIL BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | For:AL
Lu, Runshuang 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | For:AL
Wang, Xiuxia 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | For:AL
LIN, Xinrong 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | [2023/15] |
Former [2017/21] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For:AL
Lu, Runshuang 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | |||
For:AL
Wang, Xiuxia 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | |||
For:AL
LIN, Xinrong 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Runshuang L'OREAL (China) R&D Center No.550 JinYu Rd. Pudong New Area 201206 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xiuxia L'OREAL (China) R&D Center No.550 JinYu Rd. Pudong New Area 201206 Shanghai / CN | 03 /
LIN, Xinrong 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | [2017/31] |
Former [2017/25] | 01 /
LU, Runshuang 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | ||
02 /
WANG, Xiuxia L'OREAL (China) R&D Center No.550 JinYu Rd. Pudong New Area 201206 Shanghai / CN | |||
03 /
LIN, Xinrong 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | |||
Former [2017/21] | 01 /
LU, Runshuang 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | ||
02 /
WANG, Xiuxia 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | |||
03 /
LIN, Xinrong 1028 Yunqiao Road Shanghai / CN | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 14897805.9 | 16.07.2014 | [2017/21] | WO2014CN82336 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016008121 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169304 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169304 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61K8/88, A61K8/89, A61K8/25, A61K8/34, A61Q17/04, A61K8/73, A61K8/04, A61K8/891 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | A61K8/06, A61Q17/04, A61K8/34, A61K8/25, A61K8/89, A61K8/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRÜHBARE SONNENSCHUTZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ÖLPERLEN | [2017/21] | English: | SPRAYABLE SUNSCREEN COMPOSITION WITH OIL BEADS | [2017/21] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ÉCRAN SOLAIRE PULVÉRISABLE COMPRENANT DES BILLES D'HUILE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.01.2023
27.01.2023
ADMISSIBLE Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.01.2023
27.01.2023
ADMISSIBLE Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2023/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.01.2023
Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | 10.02.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2014 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | IE | 16.07.2022 | LU | 16.07.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.07.2022 | ||
LU | 16.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.07.2022 | ||
LU | 16.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.07.2022 | ||
LU | 16.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005142079 (GARRISON MARK S [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0145] , [0155]; claim 33 *; | [Y]WO2013178760 (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR]) [Y] 1-14* page 10; claim 1 * | International search | [A]DE102009009004 (SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract, claims 5-7 *; | [A]US2012015016 (GALDI ANGELIKE [US], et al) [A] 1-14* claims 1-17 *; | [A]US2012058192 (SINGLETON LAURA C [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]US2013336908 (YAMAGUCHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0019]-[0021], [0026]-[0028], [0032], [0034], [0039]-[0040] and [0046] * | Opposition | EP1535603 | WO2010060776 | - Cassiday Laura, "Hydrocolloids get personal", Inform, (20120601), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 349 - 352, XP093023818 | - Anonymous, "Best choices guidelines", Personal Care Products, CP KELCO, (20090101), pages 1 - 4, XP093023823 | - Anonymous, "KELCOGEL CG-LA gellan gum", CP Kelco, (20111103), pages 1 - 4, XP093023827 | - Formulation of invention |