EP3175215 - TIRE UNIFORMITY IMPROVEMENT THROUGH IDENTIFICATION OF A COMPOSITE UNIFORMITY PARAMETER USING MULTIVARIATE NORMAL DISTRIBUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAWBY, William, David c/o Michelin North America IP Law Group 515 Michelin Road Building 31 Greenville, South Carolina 29605 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 14898957.7 | 31.07.2014 | [2017/23] | WO2014US49165 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016018370 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175215 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3175215 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/02, G01M1/16, B29D30/00 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
G01M17/02 (EP,US);
B29D30/0061 (EP,US);
G01M1/16 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0066 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/23] | G01M17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER REIFENGLEICHFÖRMIGKEIT DURCH IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN GLEICHFÖRMIGKEITSPARAMETERS MITTELS MULTIVARIATER NORMALVERTEILUNGEN | [2017/23] | English: | TIRE UNIFORMITY IMPROVEMENT THROUGH IDENTIFICATION OF A COMPOSITE UNIFORMITY PARAMETER USING MULTIVARIATE NORMAL DISTRIBUTIONS | [2017/23] | French: | AMÉLIORATION D'UNIFORMITÉ DE PNEUMATIQUE PAR L'IDENTIFICATION D'UN PARAMÈTRE D'UNIFORMITÉ DE COMPOSITE EN UTILISANT DES DISTRIBUTIONS NORMALES MULTIVARIÉES | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 27.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2014 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | ES | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | IE | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | LU | 31.07.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | GB | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 31.07.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.07.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10281913 (AKASHI CORP) [A] 1-15* Abstract, formulas 1- 18; paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0016]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO02099377 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0067]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2005186790 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0042] *; | [A]US2012031179 (MAWBY WILLIAM DAVID [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0061]; figures 1A,1B, 3A, 3B, 3C, 4 * | International search | [Y]US6496834 (CEREGHINI PAUL M [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012031179 (MAWBY WILLIAM DAVID [US]) [Y] 1-15 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2014092722 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 12* entire document *; | [Y] - FRIENDLY et al., "Elliptical Insights: Understanding Statistical Methods Through Elliptical Geometry", (20130200), URL: http://arxiv.org/pdf/1302.4881.pdf, (20141021), XP055356446 [Y] 8 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1214/12-STS402 | [Y] - "Nolan Multivariate elliptically contoured stable distributions: theory and estimation", (20061000), URL: http://academic2.american.edu/~jpnolan/stable/EllipticalStable.pdf, (20141021), XP055356453 [Y] 9, 10 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00180-013-0396-7 |