EP3258572 - LOW SPEED AND HIGH TORQUE ELECTRIC MOTOR OUTER ROTOR, ELECTRIC MOTOR AND RELATED CRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangxi Gongbu Machinery Co., Ltd. Guo Xiwen Daqiao Industrial Park Zhangshu, Jiangxi 331200 / CN | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Liansheng Guo Xiwen Daqiao Industrial Park Zhangshu Jiangxi 331200 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Zujun Guo Xiwen Daqiao Industrial Park Zhangshu Jiangxi 331200 / CN | 03 /
YU, Lihao Guo Xiwen Daqiao Industrial Park Zhangshu Jiangxi 331200 / CN | 04 /
YU, Lin Guo Xiwen Daqiao Industrial Park Zhangshu Jiangxi 331200 / CN | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Roman, Alexis SPE Roman-Andre 35 rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/51] | Roman, Alexis Cabinet Roman 35 rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14900291.7 | 31.10.2014 | [2017/51] | WO2014CN89978 | Priority number, date | CN201410414157 | 21.08.2014 Original published format: CN201410414157 | CN201410414146 | 21.08.2014 Original published format: CN201410414146 | [2017/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016026214 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258572 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K21/22, H02K1/28, B66D1/12, H02K9/04, H02K5/16, H02K1/20, H02K9/06 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
H02K1/27 (EP);
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
B66D1/12 (EP);
H02K1/20 (EP);
H02K1/28 (EP);
H02K21/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/51] | H02K1/27, H02K21/22, H02K1/28, B66D1/12, H02K9/04, H02K5/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTORAUSSENROTOR MIT NIEDRIGER DREHZAHL UND HOHEM DREHMOMENT, ELEKTROMOTOR UND ZUGEHÖRIGER KRAN | [2017/51] | English: | LOW SPEED AND HIGH TORQUE ELECTRIC MOTOR OUTER ROTOR, ELECTRIC MOTOR AND RELATED CRANE | [2017/51] | French: | ROTOR EXTERNE DE MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE À FAIBLE VITESSE ET COUPLE ÉLEVÉ, MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET GRUE ASSOCIÉE | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2017 | Translation filed | 21.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 20.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 21.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 15.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 08.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 30.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2017 | 31.10.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]FR2708802 (MITSUBA ELECTRIC MFG CO [JP]) [I] 1,2,4-6,9,12,18,19,21 * page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 2 * [Y] 3,7,8,10,11,13-17,20; | [Y]US2002158543 (WOLTERS LAURENS [NL]) [Y] 8,11,15,16,20 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109] *; | [Y]US2005104470 (PERKINS WILLIAM P [US], et al) [Y] 13,14,17 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]US2008169719 (YU TANG YUNG [TW]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]EP2348619 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 3,10 * paragraph [0045] *; | [A]US2011227437 (KAMIKI YASUAKI [JP]) [A] 8-21 * paragraph [0017] *; | [Y]DE102011087014 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A]EP2670026 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8-21* paragraphs [0044] , [0045] * | International search | [Y]JPH11215749 (NAKAGAWA SEIMITSU KOGYO KK) [Y] 8-21 * see description, paragraphs [0007]-[0012], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [Y]CN202009300U (LIANSHENG YU) [Y] 9-21 * see description, paragraphs [0029]-[0068], and figure 1 *; | [XY]DE102011087014 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * see description, paragraphs [0017]-[0026], and figures 1 and 2 see description, paragraphs [0017]-[0026], and figures 1 and 2 * [Y] 8-21; | [A]CN103236757 (NINGXIA TIANDI NORTHWEST COAL MACH CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * see the whole document *; | [A]CN103312067 (NEW UNITED GROUP, et al) [A] 1-21* see the whole document *; | [Y]CN203691162U (WUHAN INST OF COMP PERIPHERALS) [Y] 15, 16, 20, 21 * see description, paragraphs [0019]-[0024], and figures 1 to 4 * |