EP3174346 - POWER ALLOCATION COORDINATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lili Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 14900496.2 | 27.08.2014 | [2017/22] | WO2014CN85284 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016029381 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174346 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/30, H04W52/14, H04W52/40, H04W52/36, H04W52/22 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
H04W52/365 (EP,US);
H04W52/30 (US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,US);
H04W52/228 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | H04W52/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSZUWEISUNGSKOORDINATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2017/22] | English: | POWER ALLOCATION COORDINATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2017/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COORDINATION D'ALLOCATION DE PUISSANCE | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2017 | Translation filed | 27.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 27.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013025562 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0088] , [0119] , [0125] - [0127] - [0213] , [0214] , [0270] , [0276] , [0293] , [0304] , [0307] *; | [X]US2014056278 (MARINIER PAUL [CA], et al) [X] 1-8* paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0084] , [0133] - [0136] - [0213] - [0216] * | International search | [A]CN101340622 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010273515 (FABIEN JEAN-AICARD [US], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [X]CN103733697 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS) [X] 1-26 * description, paragraphs [0073], [0086]-[0089], [0113], [0131], [0143], [0300], [0301], [0394]-[0402], [0405], [0440], and figures 2A, 7-9 * |