EP3193873 - ORALLY ADMINISTRABLE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF DETERRING ABUSE BY INTRANASAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inspirion Delivery Sciences LLC 100 Southgate Parkway, Suite 150 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Inspirion Delivery Technologies, LLC 612 Corporate Way, Suite 10 Valley Cottage, NY 10989 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Manish S. 103 Park Street West Caldwell, New Jersey 07706 / US | 02 /
DIFALCO, Ray J. 217 Stellan Ave. Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US | 03 /
AIGNER, Stefan c/o Inspirion Delivery Technologies LLC 612 Corporate Way Suite 10 Valley Cottage, New York 10989 / US | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 14902242.8 | 15.09.2014 | [2017/30] | WO2014US55616 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016043698 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193873 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/36, A61K31/485, A61K31/137 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/4468 (EP);
A61K9/0043 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | A61K31/485 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | ORAL VERABREICHBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES MISSBRAUCHS DURCH INTRANASALE VERABREICHUNG | [2017/30] | English: | ORALLY ADMINISTRABLE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF DETERRING ABUSE BY INTRANASAL ADMINISTRATION | [2017/30] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉVENTION DES ADDICTIONS PAR ADMINISTRATION INTRANASALE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 10.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/50] | 12.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2018 | 30.09.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02094254 (ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A]US2003068371 (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [X]US2011076325 (SHAH MANISH S [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0083] * * example - * | International search | [XY]US2012164209 (SHAH MANISH S [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-15, 17-26 * entire document * [Y] 3, 16; | [Y]US2009082466 (BABUL NAJIB [US]) [Y] 3, 16 * entire document *; | [A]US2005080012 (MICKLE TRAVIS [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2010015223 (CAILLY-DUFESTEL VINCENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2012202839 (EMIGH JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A] - HARRIS et al., "Abuse Potential, Pharmacokinetics, Pharmacodynamics, and Safety of Intranasally Administered Crushed Oxycodone HCI Abuse-Deterrent Controlled-Release Tablets in Recreational Opioid Users", J Clin Pharmacol, (20131211), vol. 54, pages 468 - 477, XP055364524 [A] 1-26 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcph.235 |