EP3224046 - OMNIPHOBIC COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Marilyn Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14906747.2 | 27.11.2014 | [2017/40] | WO2014CN92376 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016082153 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224046 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/12, B05D5/08, B05D1/00, B29C59/14 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
B05D5/083 (EP,US);
C09D5/1668 (US);
B05D1/62 (EP,US);
B05D3/007 (US);
B05D3/142 (US);
B29C59/14 (EP,US);
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
C08J7/126 (EP,US);
C09D133/12 (US);
| C-Set: |
B05D2451/00, B05D2401/40, B05D2401/33 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B32B33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | OMNIPHOBE BESCHICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | OMNIPHOBIC COATING | [2017/40] | French: | REVÊTEMENT OMNIPHOBE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2017 | 30.11.2022 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0497189 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 41-47; figure -; examples 5-7,10-12; claim - *; | [Y]WO2007068760 (ESSILOR INT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 9-14; figure -; examples 4-7; claims 1-3,7,9,14-17,20,21,24,31,33,40,43,45 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 6 * * page 9, lines 19-31 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 15 * * page 18, lines 9-16 * * page 20, line 9 - page 24, line 8 *; | [Y]WO2008141981 (ESSILOR INT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 1-12; examples 11-15; claims 1,15,16,18,27,32,33,37,39 * * page 8, line 36 - page 9, line 35 * * page 14, lines 9-13,20-22 * * page 15, lines 32-35 * * page 19, lines 6-12 * * page 20, line 6 - page 21, line 9 * * page 22, line 33 - page 27, line 8 *; | [Y]US2010033819 (SCHULZ ULRIKE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10* paragraph [0049]; claims 1,2,11,14,23,24 *; | [XYI]WO2012138992 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0102] , [0104]; figure 1; example 5; claims 14,15,18,21,22,31,33-36,38,41,48,53,56 * [Y] 3-6,9,10 [I] 7; | [XYI]WO2014135353 (EVONIK INDUSTRIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8 * page 1, lines 1-13; claims 1,7,10,15 * * page 2, lines 15-30 * * page 5, lines 7-21 * [Y] 3-5,9,10 [I] 7; | [E]WO2015139824 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,4-6,8 * page 2, line 24 - page 7, line 5; example .; claims 1,5-7,9,11 * * page 9, lines 5-9 * * page 11, lines 6-11 * | International search | [A]CN1663693 (UNIV XIAMEN [CN]) [A] 1-10* examples 1-3 *; | [A]EP2348757 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * embodiments *; | [X]CN102179982 (XEROX CORP) [X] 1-10 * description paragraphs 0019, 0028 and 0033, Figure 2 *; | [A]CN103881419 (CHINESE ACAD TECH INST PHYSICS) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-6 *; | [A]CN103951277 (UNIV JIANGNAN) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-4 * | by applicant | EP0497189 | WO2007068760 | WO2008141981 | US2010033819 | WO2012138992 | WO2014135353 | WO2015139824 |