EP3234726 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEPLOYING PREDICTIVE MODELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKER, Tristan C. c/o Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14908644.9 | 23.12.2014 | [2017/43] | WO2014US72248 | Priority number, date | US201414569895 | 15.12.2014 Original published format: US201414569895 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016099577 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3234726 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06E1/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06N5/045 (US);
G06Q10/067 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/102 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | G06E1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG PRÄDIKTIVER MODELLE | [2017/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEPLOYING PREDICTIVE MODELS | [2017/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉPLOYER DES MODÈLES PRÉDICTIFS | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 30.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 06.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014172560 (SATYAVOLU RAMAKRISHNA VENKATA [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0022] , [0126] - [0127] - [0156] , [0164] , [0171] - [0181] - [0190] , [0251] , [0268] - [0271] - [0277] - [0280]; figures 1-75 * [I] 2-13; | [A] - Anonymous, "Workflow engine - Wikipedia", (20140709), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Workflow_engine&oldid=616213776, (20180608), XP055482513 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Workflow application - Wikipedia", (20141105), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Workflow_application&oldid=632539307, (20180608), XP055482516 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Business Process Model and Notation - Wikipedia", (20141214), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Business_Process_Model_and_Notation&oldid=637976290, (20180608), XP055482519 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Software deployment - Wikipedia", (20141203), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Software_deployment&oldid=636494402, (20180608), XP055482524 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2011225157 (RAJARAM SHYAM SUNDAR [US], et al) [A] 1-33* (entire document). *; | [X]US2014172560 (SATYAVOLU RAMAKRISHNA VENKATA [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * , para. [0013], [0126]-[0128], [0138], [0153], [0155]-[0156], [0164]-[0165], [0167], [0171]-[0176], [0179]-[0180], [0190], [0195], [0200], [0222], [0229]-[0230], [0235], [0268]-[0270], [0273], [0277], [0279]-[0280], and [0283], and Figs. 1-2 and 72. *; | [A]US8886654 (AGRAWAL SANJAY S [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * (entire document). * |