EP3232713 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Jinrong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14909522.6 | 31.12.2014 | [2017/42] | WO2014CN95979 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016106714 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232713 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/24, H04B10/272, H04J14/04, H04B10/2581, H04Q11/00, H04B10/079 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H04J14/04 (EP,US);
H04B10/07953 (US);
H04B10/2581 (EP,US);
H04B10/272 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0066 (US);
H04W40/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | H04W40/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2017/42] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2017 | Translation filed | 13.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 13.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1020056 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [IA]CN102916747 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH); | [A]EP2679977 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]US2014003807 (HAMAGUCHI HIROKI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2014056526 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]US2014140694 (ZHOU XIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2014270759 (DJORDJEVIC IVAN B [US], et al); | International search | [A]CN101741712 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]EP2341675 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2013202304 (BOYD EDWARD W [US], et al) |