EP2885996 - Double layer coiling zipper and zipper slider [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genmore Zipper Corporation No. 273, Sun-Jin Street Sulin District T'ai pei 238 / TW | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Lien-Chou No.273, Sun-Jin Street, Sulin District 238 New Taipei City / TW | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Whitaker, Iain Mark Alban Patent Agency Future Business Centre Kings Hedges Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, CB4 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Whitaker, Iain Mark Alban Patent Agency The Old Pump House 1a Stone Cross St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 4AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15000001.6 | 15.02.2012 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | CN20112069952U | 15.03.2011 Original published format: CN 201120069952 U | CN20111088172 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: CN201110088172 | TW20110209711 | 30.05.2011 Original published format: TW 100209711 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2885996 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2885996 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/12, B29D5/06, A44B19/40, A44B19/32, B29C45/14 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
A44B19/12 (EP);
A44B19/32 (EP);
A44B19/406 (EP);
B29D5/06 (EP);
B29C2045/14737 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Doppelschichtiger Spulenreißverschluss und Reißverschluss | [2015/26] | English: | Double layer coiling zipper and zipper slider | [2015/26] | French: | Fermeture éclair enroulée à double couche et curseur de fermeture éclair | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 14.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12250032.5 / EP2499929 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2012 | AL | 06.07.2016 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | IE | 15.02.2017 | LU | 15.02.2017 | MT | 15.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2019/52] |
Former [2019/47] | HU | 15.02.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.02.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 06.07.2016 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0111889 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 11, line 8 - line 16 * * page 12, line 19 - line 22 *; | [A]US2010154179 (BLACKFORD WOODY [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] *; | [A]EP2016848 (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | TW441257B |