EP2922303 - Display device for managing a plurality of time source data and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jeongsim 19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Im, Changwook 19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 15000077.6 | 14.01.2015 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | US201461947434P | 04.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461947434 P | KR20140075856 | 20.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140075856 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2922303 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/43, H04N21/443, H04N21/4627 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
H04N21/42215 (EP,US);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2015/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung zur Verwaltung einer Vielzahl von Zeitquellendaten und Verfahren zur Steuerung davon | [2015/39] | English: | Display device for managing a plurality of time source data and method for controlling the same | [2015/39] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage destiné à gérer une pluralité de données source temporelles et procédé pour le commander | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 02.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2019 | 09.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/11] | 27.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004029536 (HAMATSU MAKOTO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0051] , [0063] - [0065] - [0069] , [0074] - [0079] - [0188] *; | [I]US2006064716 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0214] , [0219] *; | [A]US2011314386 (JEONG YOUNGHO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014013008 (LAZARUS ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |