EP3056799 - Luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Urama GmbH Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 7b 32312 Lübbecke / DE | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schütte, Marcus Fahrenhorster Straße 1 D - 32312 Lübbecke / DE | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Schober, Mirko Thielking & Elbertzhagen Patentanwälte Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Thielking & Elbertzhagen Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gadderbaumer Straße 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 15000441.4 | 13.02.2015 | [2016/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3056799 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3056799 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/06, F21V21/002, F21V21/112, // F21V21/14 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
F21V21/002 (EP);
F21S8/061 (EP);
F21V21/112 (EP);
F21V21/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2016/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Leuchte | [2016/33] | English: | Luminaire | [2016/33] | French: | Éclairage | [2016/33] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2015 | AL | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | MT | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.02.2015 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.02.2015 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE202007014732U (DERKSEN LICHTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2014135554 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [A]US2012075857 (VERBRUGH STEFAN MARCUS [NL]) [A] 1 * figures 1,5a *; | [A]DE202012003859U (ROSIN AYAL [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE202007014732U | DE202012103937U | DE7838482U | EP1538391 |