EP2933361 - MONOFILAMENTS WITH HIGH ABRASION AND SHAPE STABILITY, LOW SLIDING FRICTION AND PROPENSITY TOWARDS SOILING, TEXTILE PLANAR STRUCTURES CONTAINING THE SAME, AND THE USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perlon Nextrusion Monofil GmbH Max-Fischer-Strasse 11 86399 Bobingen / DE | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüning, Hans-Joachim Mittlerer Lechfeldweg 20c 86179 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Büdenbender, Jürgen Am Weißen Kreuz 11 41539 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
Heckenbenner, Pascal Erzgebirgsstr. 22 86199 Augsburg / DE | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim Antoniterstraße 9 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/43] | Ackermann, Joachim Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 15000762.3 | 14.03.2015 | [2015/43] | Priority number, date | DE20142003285U | 16.04.2014 Original published format: DE 202014003285 U | DE20141014479 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014014479 | [2015/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933361 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933361 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D01F1/10, D21F1/00 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
D21F1/0027 (EP,US);
D01F8/14 (US);
B65G15/34 (US);
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
D01F6/665 (EP);
D01F6/765 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2015/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MONOFILAMENTE MIT HOHER ABRIEB- UND FORMBESTÄNDIGKEIT, GERINGER GLEITREIBUNG UND ANSCHMUTZNEIGUNG, TEXTILE FLÄCHENGEBILDE ENTHALTEND DIESE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2019/25] | English: | MONOFILAMENTS WITH HIGH ABRASION AND SHAPE STABILITY, LOW SLIDING FRICTION AND PROPENSITY TOWARDS SOILING, TEXTILE PLANAR STRUCTURES CONTAINING THE SAME, AND THE USE OF SAME | [2015/43] | French: | MONO-FILAMENTS AYANT UNE STABILITÉ DIMENSIONNELLE ET UNE RÉSISTANCE À L'USURE ÉLEVÉES, UN FAIBLE FROTTEMENT DE GLISSEMENT ET RÉSISTANT AUX TACHES, STRUCTURES PLATES EN TEXTILE LES COMPRENANT ET SON UTILISATION | [2015/43] |
Former [2015/43] | Monofilamente mit hoher Abrieb- und Formbeständigkeit, geringer Gleitreibung und Anschmutzneigung, textile Flächengebilde enthaltend diese und deren Verwendung | Examination procedure | 11.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19000383.0 / EP3608454 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2015 | AL | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | IE | 14.03.2020 | LU | 14.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.03.2015 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | HR | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001146627 (LION CORP) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XAI]JP2008025059 (UNITIKA FIBERS LTD) [X] 1-6,11 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0021] - [0025] - [0031] - [0033] * [A] 7-9,13 [I] 10,12; | [XAI]WO2009105083 (UNIV AKRON [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,10,12 * examples 3,4 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0031] * [A] 2,3,5,7-9,13 [I] 12; | [A]JP2009228177 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]JP2011202298 (TORAY MONOFILAMENT CO) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2012180625 (TORAY MONOFILAMENT CO) [X] 1-7,10-13 * example 6 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0035] * [I] 8,9 | by applicant | DE69609709T | DE102004054804 | DE102005044435 |