EP2930278 - WASH BASIN MADE OF SHEET METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alape GmbH Am Gräbicht 1-9 38644 Goslar Hahndorf / DE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kloss, Jürgen Parkstr. 4a 38315 Schladen / DE | 02 /
Jürgens, Andrea Am Streuerkamp 6 38667 Bad Harzburg / DE | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 15000955.3 | 02.04.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | DE20142002987U | 08.04.2014 Original published format: DE 202014002987 U | [2015/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2930278 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2930278 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/18, B21D51/18, E03C1/33 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
E03C1/18 (EP);
B21D51/18 (EP);
E03C1/33 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | E03C1/18, B21D51/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHBECKEN AUS STAHLBLECH | [2015/42] | English: | WASH BASIN MADE OF SHEET METAL | [2015/42] | French: | LAVABO EN TÔLE D'ACIER | [2015/42] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE8616776U (ALAPE ADOLF LAMPRECHT) [I] 1-9,11-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 6; figure - *; | [I]DE7820852U (ALAPE ADOLF LAMPRECHT) [I] 1-4,9,13,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [I]DE7730393U (ALAPE ADOLF LAMPRECHT) [I] 1-4,9,13,14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19613527 |