EP2940623 - DATA EXCHANGE METHOD BETWEEN READER AND CHIP CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büttner, Bernhard Nebeler Strasse 18 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
Griesmeier, Robert Josef-Völkl-Strasse 16 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | 03 /
Hartel, Karl Eglof Reutterstraße 74 80689 München / DE | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 15001542.8 | 08.05.2012 | [2015/45] | Priority number, date | DE201110101297 | 11.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011101297 | DE201110112031 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011112031 | [2015/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2940623 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2940623 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/07, G06K19/077, G07F7/08 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
G06F13/4081 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (EP,US);
G06K19/07733 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G07F7/0893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2015/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DATENAUSTAUSCH ZWISCHEN LESEGERÄT UND CHIPKARTE | [2015/45] | English: | DATA EXCHANGE METHOD BETWEEN READER AND CHIP CARD | [2015/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCHANGE DE DONNÉES ENTRE UN LECTEUR ET UNE CARTE À PUCE | [2015/45] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/06] | 25.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12721174.6 / EP2707833 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005029360 (RHELIMI ALAIN [FR]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021] - [0026] - [0033] , [0034] , [0039] *; | [X]DE102006053789 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] , [0030]; figure - *; | [X]US2008156871 (FIDALGO JEAN-CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0085]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2003085287 (GRAY ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]DE10344049 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009]; figure 5; claim 8 *; | [A]DE19523275 (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 40 - line 50; figure 2 * | by applicant | WO2008058743 | DE10344852 |