EP2993180 - NOVEL JNK INHIBITOR MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xigen Inflammation Ltd. Arch. Makariou III 195 Neocleous House 3030 Limassol / CY | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonny, Christophe En vernaules 1580 Avenches / CH | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15002211.9 | 21.06.2011 | [2016/10] | Priority number, date | WO2010EP03729 | 21.06.2010 Original published format: PCT/EP2010/003729 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993180 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2993180 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K14/47, G01N33/53 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K7/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K7/08 (CN,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K14/001 (US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
C07K14/4702 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/18 (CN);
C07K16/44 (US);
G01N33/53 (KR);
A61K2039/552 (US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/34 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE JNK-HEMMERMOLEKÜLE | [2016/10] | English: | NOVEL JNK INHIBITOR MOLECULES | [2016/10] | French: | NOUVELLES MOLÉCULES D'INHIBITEUR JNK | [2016/10] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11727401.9 / EP2582714 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2018 | 30.06.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2011 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | IE | 21.06.2020 | LU | 21.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 21.06.2011 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 21.06.2011 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NO | 15.04.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007031098 (XIGEN SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * SEQ. ID. NO:1, 2, 9; p.22 *; | [I]WO2009143865 (XIGEN SA [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * Table 1; p. 11, l. 16; SEQ. ID. NO: 17, 39, 47 *; | [A] - BONNY C ET AL, "Cell-permeable peptide inhibitors of JNK: novel blockers of beta-cell death", DIABETES, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, US, (20010101), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.2337/DIABETES.50.1.77, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 77 - 82, XP002172261 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.50.1.77 | [A] - PAN JING ET AL, "Small peptide inhibitor of JNKs protects against MPTP-induced nigral dopaminergic injury via inhibiting the JNK-signaling pathway", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (201002), vol. 90, no. 2, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 156 - 167, XP002616484 [A] 1-15 * p. 157, col. 1, first par; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/LABINVEST.2009.124 | [A] - ROBINSON J A ET AL, "Properties and structure-activity studies of cyclic beta-hairpin peptidomimetics based on the cationic antimicrobial peptide protegrin I", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, (20050315), vol. 13, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2005.01.009, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 2055 - 2064, XP004759006 [A] 1-15 * Table 4a, compounds 1, 24-92; Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2005.01.009 | by applicant | WO9705265 | US5674980 | US5804604 | WO2007031280 | - HUI ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (200706), vol. 39, no. 6 | - ZHUANG ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20060329), vol. 26, no. 13, pages 3551 - 3560 | - KUAN ET AL., CURRENT DRUG TARGETS - CNS & NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS, (200502), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 63 - 67 | - GUENAT ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2006), vol. 11, pages 1015 - 1026 | - GRANTHAM, R., SCIENCE, (1974), vol. 185, pages 862 - 864 | - KARLIN, PNAS USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - PEARSON, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 183, pages 63 - 98 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), pages 387 - 395 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, J. MOL. BIOL., (1981), vol. 147, pages 195 - 197 | - ELLIOTT; O'HARE, CELL, (1997), vol. 88, pages 223 - 233 | - JACKSON, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10691 - 10695 | - RUBEN, S. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 1 - 8 | - HAUBER, J. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 1181 - 1187 | - FRANKEL, A. D. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 70 - 73 | - FRANKEL, A. D. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 6297 - 6300 | - GARCIA, J. A., EMBO J., (1988), vol. 7, page 3143 | - SADAIE, M. R., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, page 1 | - BACHMAIR, A. ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 56, pages 1019 - 1032 | - KAMEYAMA ET AL., BIOPO/YMERS, (2007), vol. 88, pages 98 - 107 |