EP2975196 - WALL ELEMENT AND COMBINATION OF WALL ELEMENT AND LIFTING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kappema Fertigteilindustrie GmbH Lambacher Straße 14 4623 Gunskirchen / AT | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kastner, Erich Sulzbacher Straße 77 83334 Inzell / DE | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 15002298.6 | 15.07.2014 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | AT20130000575 | 15.07.2013 Original published format: AT 5752013 | [2016/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975196 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2975196 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/14, E04C2/52, E04C2/04 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
E04G21/142 (EP,AT);
E04G21/145 (AT);
B66C1/62 (AT);
B66C1/66 (AT);
B66C1/666 (AT);
E04C2/526 (EP);
E04C2002/045 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2016/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 20.07.2016 | ME | 20.07.2016 | Title | German: | WANDELEMENT UND KOMBINATION VON WANDELEMENT UND LASTAUFNAHMEMITTEL | [2016/03] | English: | WALL ELEMENT AND COMBINATION OF WALL ELEMENT AND LIFTING MEANS | [2016/03] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE MUR ET COMBINATION D'ÉLÉMENT DE MUR ET MOYENS DE LEVAGE DUDIT MUR | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/03] | ÉLÉMENT DE MUR ET COMBINATION D'ÉLÉMENT DE MUR ET MOYENS DE LEVAGE DUDIT MUR | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 07.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14450037.8 / EP2826930 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2014 | AL | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | GB | 15.07.2018 | IE | 15.07.2018 | LU | 15.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.07.2014 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
GB | 15.07.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.07.2014 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
GB | 15.07.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
GB | 15.07.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
GB | 15.07.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]FR2948139 (FEHR [FR]) [X] 1-4,9-14 * the whole document * [A] 5,7,8 [I] 6; | [XA]DE19946320 (BOEGL MAX BAUUNTERNEHMUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,9-14 * the whole document * [A] 5,7,8 | by applicant | AT349715B | DE10351487 | DE20008530U |