EP2988571 - METHOD FOR MAKING A FLEXIBLE HEATING SYSTEM, FLEXIBLE HEATING SYSTEM AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interactive Wear AG Petersbrunner Strasse 3 82319 Starnberg / DE | For all designated states Forster Rohner AG Flurhofstrasse 150 9006 St. Gallen / CH | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Jan Zeppelinstr. 43 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Röpert, Andreas Kaiser-Wilhelm-Str. 7 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 15002472.7 | 20.08.2015 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | DE20141012663 | 22.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014012663 | [2016/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988571 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/34, A41D13/005 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
H05B3/342 (EP);
A41D13/0051 (EP);
H05B2203/005 (EP);
H05B2203/013 (EP);
H05B2203/036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2016/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLEXIBLEN HEIZSYSTEMS, FLEXIBLES HEIZSYSTEM UND VERWENDUNG | [2016/08] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING A FLEXIBLE HEATING SYSTEM, FLEXIBLE HEATING SYSTEM AND USE | [2016/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE SOUPLE, SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE SOUPLE ET UTILISATION | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1021064 (MALDEN MILLS IND INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,12,14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024]; figures 3,4 * [I] 3-7,9-11,13; | [XI]US2008083721 (KAISERMAN TERRANCE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12,14 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0112]; figures 9,10 * [I] 3-7,9-11,13; | [X]EP1905579 (TEXTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,12,14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2a,2b *; | [X]US2011172750 (CASSIDY DAVID ELLSWORTH [US], et al) [X] 1,8,14 * paragraph [0044]; figure 4 *; | [X]DE1690576 (INUI TOSHIAKI) [X] 1,2,8,10,12,14 * figures 2,3,6 * |