EP2998919 - METHODS AND APPARATUS TO MONITOR MEDIA PRESENTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Nielsen Company (US), LLC 150 North Martingale Road Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borland, Robert Peter 2433 Appaloosa Trail Palm Harbour, Florida 34685 / US | 02 /
Rubin, Jonathon Brett 212 Osceola Road Belleair, Florida 33756 / US | 03 /
Stringer, Anthony B. 501 Brooker Creek Blvd. Oldsmar, Florida 34677 / US | 04 /
Schenker, Adam 7401 Clearview Drive Tampa, Florida 33634 / US | 05 /
Paranjape, Shailendra 501 Brooker Creek Blvd. Oldsmar, Florida 34677 / US | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 15002701.9 | 17.09.2015 | [2016/12] | Priority number, date | US201414489390 | 17.09.2014 Original published format: US201414489390 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2998919 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0204 (EP,US);
H04L67/025 (CN);
G06F16/95 (CN);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (CN);
H04L65/60 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON MEDIENPRÄSENTATIONEN | [2016/12] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS TO MONITOR MEDIA PRESENTATIONS | [2016/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE PRÉSENTATIONS MULTIMÉDIA | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2021 | 10.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/01] | 23.11.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/01] | Appeal following examination | 01.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1979/21 | 01.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 02.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008062895 (CHAPMAN KARL [GB], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0022] - [0061] *; | [I]US2011289037 (TULLIO JOSEPH C [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0025] *; | [I]US2012095861 (FENG JUNLAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0046] * | by applicant | US5481294 | US6108637 |