EP2987479 - METHOD FOR MEDICATION AT A PRESCRIBED TIME, A DISPENSER AND A TAPE FOR USE WITH THE METHOD AND A CLOSED LOOP COMPRISING THE DISPENSER AND THE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4C CARE & CONSULTANCY BV Leeuweriklaan 12 5561TP Riethoven / NL | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN Esch, Josephus Jacobus Johannes Maria Leeuweriklaan 12 5561 TP Riethoven / NL | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 15002731.6 | 28.04.2008 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | NL20071033806 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: NL 1033806 | NL20071033807 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: NL 1033807 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2987479 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61J7/00, A61J7/04 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
A61J7/0409 (EP,US);
A61J7/0084 (EP,US);
A61J2200/30 (EP,US);
A61J2205/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MEDIKAMENTÖSEN BEHANDLUNG ZU EINER VORGESCHRIEBENEN ZEIT, AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG UND BAND ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DEM VERFAHREN UND GESCHLOSSENER KREISLAUF MIT DER AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG UND DEM BAND | [2016/08] | English: | METHOD FOR MEDICATION AT A PRESCRIBED TIME, A DISPENSER AND A TAPE FOR USE WITH THE METHOD AND A CLOSED LOOP COMPRISING THE DISPENSER AND THE TAPE | [2016/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT À UN MOMENT PRESCRIT, DISTRIBUTEUR ET RUBAN DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC LE PROCÉDÉ ET BOUCLE FERMÉE COMPRENANT LE DISTRIBUTEUR ET LE RUBAN | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 04.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08737556.4 / EP2150226 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0146016 (RAST RODGER H [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 11, line 10 - line 27 * * page 12, line 11 - line 26 * * page 31, line 30 - page 32, line 8 * * figures 2,3,23 * [I] 3 |