EP3020381 - AUXILIARY DEVICE FOR A STRETCHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/20] | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR A STRETCHER | ||
[2017/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wietmarscher Ambulanz- und Sonderfahrzeug GmbH Lingener Strasse 1 49835 Wietmarschen / DE | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gotthardt, Daniel Ellerbrookskamp 9 22397 Hamburg / DE | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Willems, Volker Patentanwälte Weisse, Moltmann & Willems PartGmbB Am Lomberg 13 42555 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Willems, Volker Patentanwälte Weisse, Moltmann & Willems Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Am Lomberg 13 42555 Velbert / DE | Application number, filing date | 15002948.6 | 16.10.2015 | [2016/20] | Priority number, date | DE20141016905 | 17.11.2014 Original published format: DE102014016905 | [2016/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3020381 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3020381 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61G3/02, A61G3/08, // A61G1/056 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
A61G3/0236 (EP);
A61G3/0245 (EP);
A61G3/0254 (EP);
A61G3/0272 (EP);
A61G3/029 (EP);
A61G3/0833 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2016/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HILFSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FAHRTRAGE | [2016/20] | English: | AUXILIARY DEVICE FOR A STRETCHER | [2017/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUXILIAIRE POUR UN BRANCARD | [2016/20] |
Former [2016/20] | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR A STRETCHER | Examination procedure | 16.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 15.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2015 | AL | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | MT | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | PT | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | IE | 16.10.2018 | LU | 16.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.10.2015 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2203999 (MACCLESFIELD MOTOR BODIES) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 5,8,9; | [X]EP1034764 (STEM SRL [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE102008005900 (BAYERISCHES ROTES KREUZ KOERPE [DE]) [X] 1,5,9 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 30] , [0 35] * * figures 1-5, 9-12 * * ferner noch:; paragraph [0036] * * und die folgenden *; | [X]WO2009135803 (STEM SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1 * page 6, line 27 - page 14, line 18 ** figures 1-9 *; | [X]WO2012006719 (JOANISSE DENIS [CA]) [X] 1 * paragraph [1024] - paragraph [1045] * * figures 1-3, 10 * | by applicant | DE20312525U | DE202004007621U | DE102011078803 |