EP3040619 - FIREPLACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spartherm Feuerungstechnik GmbH Maschweg 38 49324 Melle / DE | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rokossa, Gerhard Manfred Maschweg 10 49143 Bissendorf / DE | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Pott, Ulrich, et al Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Pott, Ulrich, et al Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 15002986.6 | 20.10.2015 | [2016/27] | Priority number, date | DE20141019338 | 29.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014019338 | [2016/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040619 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3040619 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24B1/192 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
F24B1/192 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2016/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FEUERSTÄTTE | [2016/27] | English: | FIREPLACE | [2016/27] | French: | FOYER | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 03.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2015 | AL | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | IE | 20.10.2017 | LU | 20.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3082759 (EDMONDS DAVID, et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,15 * the whole document * [I] 8,9,11-13,18; | [X]EP1662204 (SPARTHERM FEUERUNGSTECHNIK GMB [DE]) [X] 1-3,16,17 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [X]FR3005144 (FONDIS SA [FR]) [X] 1,16,17 * figures 2-5 *; | [X]EP2515043 (STUV S A [BE]) [X] 1 * figures 6-8 *; | [X]US4884556 (ALDEN FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,16,17 * figure 5 * |