EP3158983 - ADAPTIVE ATTACHMENT WHEEL FOR WHEELCHAIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drummer, Christian Lindenanger 8 91356 Kircherenbach / DE | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drummer, Christian Lindenanger 8 91356 Kirchehrenbach / DE | 02 /
Herrmann, Dominik Wannbach 173 91362 Pretzfeld / DE | [2017/17] | Application number, filing date | 15003022.9 | 22.10.2015 | [2017/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158983 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/02, A61G5/10, A61G5/06 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61G5/1083 (EP,US);
A61G5/003 (US);
A61G5/02 (EP,US);
A61G5/06 (EP,US);
A61G5/1051 (EP,US);
A61G5/0875 (US);
A61G5/1008 (EP,US);
A61G5/1016 (EP,US);
A61G5/1035 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES VORSATZRAD FÜR ROLLSTÜHLE | [2017/17] | English: | ADAPTIVE ATTACHMENT WHEEL FOR WHEELCHAIRS | [2017/17] | French: | ROUE AVANT ADAPTABLE POUR FAUTEUILS ROULANTS | [2017/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102007014533 (FOEHL WALTER [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008315549 (DOUGHERTY PATRICK S [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2841462 (MACKE HERVE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013009382 (HAY CARL M [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2882253 (MACKE HERVE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102007014533 | DE10028338 | DE10102855 | DE20007793U | DE4107410 | EP0911010 |