EP3029772 - ELECTRICAL CONTACT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE CONTACT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/23] | ELECTRICAL CONTACT MEMBER AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING THE CONTACT MEMBER | ||
[2018/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphenol-Tuchel Electronics GmbH August-Häusser-Strasse 10 74080 Heilbronn / DE | For all designated states Konfektion E Elektronik GmbH Im Klingenfeld 21 74594 Kressberg-Marktlustenau / DE | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNGERER, Christian Am Baumgarten 5 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | 02 /
KERNER, Wolfgang Am Hochbehälter 3/1 74235 Erlenbach / DE | 03 /
KNÖDLER, Michael Pfarrhausstraße 29 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
EISERMANN, Peter Am Roten Kreuz 8 91550 Dinkelsbühl / DE | 05 /
KAMM, Klaus Gaisfeldweg 3b 91550 Dinkelsbühl / DE | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstraße 19 80331 München / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2016/23] | Wendels, Stefan Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15003139.1 | 03.11.2015 | [2016/23] | Priority number, date | DE201410117829 | 04.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014117829 | [2016/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029772 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3029772 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/02, H01R43/02, // H01R13/115 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H01R43/02 (EP);
H01R4/027 (EP);
H01R13/115 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (EP);
H01R4/184 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES KONTAKTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DES KONTAKTSYSTEMS | [2018/16] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONTACT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE CONTACT SYSTEM | [2018/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTACT ELECTRIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DU SYSTEME DE CONTACT | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/23] | ELEKTRISCHES KONTAKTTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN DES KONTAKTTEILS | ||
Former [2016/23] | ELECTRICAL CONTACT MEMBER AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING THE CONTACT MEMBER | ||
Former [2016/23] | PIECE DE CONTACT ELECTRIQUE ET PROCEDE DE CONNEXION DE LA PIECE DE CONTACT | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 12.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2015 | AL | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | IE | 03.11.2018 | LU | 03.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 03.11.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 03.11.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 03.11.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 03.11.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19709772 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 67; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE2134078 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-9 * pages 7,8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0774825 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, lines 26-30; figure 8A *; | [A]EP2591873 (NEXANS [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * | by applicant | DE8913569U | DE10060394 |