EP3165578 - METALLIC OFFSET PRINTING INK WITH MIRROR FINISH AND PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eckart GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | [2017/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Michael Erbsenbodenstrasse 7a 91207 Lauf / DE | 02 /
Reitzenstein, Dörte Beethovenstrasse 13 91207 Lauf / DE | 03 /
Lindl, Alexandra Kirchröttenback D3 91220 Schnaittach / DE | 04 /
Plitzko, Yvonne Toplerstrasse 13 90480 Nürnberg / DE | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Henglein, Frank Arwed Eckart GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | [2017/19] | Application number, filing date | 15003202.7 | 09.11.2015 | [2017/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165578 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/037, C09B67/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/64 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/644 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/03 (KR);
C09D11/033 (KR);
C09D11/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLISCHE OFFSETDRUCKFARBE MIT SPIEGELGLANZ UND DRUCKVERFAHREN | [2017/19] | English: | METALLIC OFFSET PRINTING INK WITH MIRROR FINISH AND PRINTING METHOD | [2017/19] | French: | ENCRE D'IMPRESSION OFFSET METALLIQUE PRESENTANT UN BRILLANT SPECULAIRE ET PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION | [2017/19] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102009037323 (ECKART GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11,13-15,17-19 * claims 1, 1, 10, 14 * * Beispiele * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraphs [0093] , [0105] , [0107] , [0113] *; | [X]EP2083052 (ECKART GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13,17,19 * claims 1, 5, 7, 10, 12, 16-21, 25, 26, 31, 32, 36, 40 * * paragraphs [0089] - [0092] - [ 116] , [ 134] , [ 153] * * Beispiele *; | [X]EP2746349 (ECKART GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-13,16,17,19 * claims 1, 12-16 * * Beispiele und Vergleichsbeispiele * * paragraphs [0025] - [0033] - [0 64] - [0065] - [ 143] - [0148] - [ 152] * * paragraphs [0183] - [0188] *; | [X]DE102008029821 (ECKART GMBH [DE]) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0062] , [0064] , [0075] , [0082] , [0093] , [0114] * * claims 1,3,10,13-15 * * Beispiele *; | [X]JP2003049091 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK, et al) [X] 1-11,13,17 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 40] , [0043] , [0 75] - [0076]; claims 5-7 * * example 1 *; | [A]EP1338630 (EPPLE DRUCKFARBEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0071] , [0074] , [0075] * | by applicant | JP4119594B | JP2007021736 | WO2013119387 | EP2102294 | EP1613702 | EP1621586 | EP0886671 |