EP3085446 - INCUBATION GUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROIMMUN Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG Seekamp 31 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG Seekamp 31 23560 Lübeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaffka, Christian Goethestraße 19 23942 Dassow / DE | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Richter, Carsten EUROIMMUN Medizinische Labordlagnostika AG Seekamp 31 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 15003625.9 | 21.12.2015 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | EP20150001230 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15001230 | [2016/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085446 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/31, B01L9/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B01L9/52 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/50 (KR);
B01L2300/0809 (KR);
B01L2300/0822 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0877 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,KR,US);
G01N1/312 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | B01L9/00, B01L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INKUBATIONSRINNE | [2016/43] | English: | INCUBATION GUTTER | [2016/43] | French: | CANAL D'INCUBATION | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 21.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004001779 (ANDERSON CLIFFORD L [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0022]; figure 2 * [A] 13-15; | [XI]US6673620 (LOEFFLER HERBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 39 * * column 6, lines 23-44 * * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 36 * * figures 1,4,5,7,11 * * claim 15 * [I] 14,15; | [XI]US2011044865 (GROISMAN ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] * * example 3 * * figure 2 * [I] 14,15; | [A]EP2660602 (EUROIMMUN MEDIZINISCHE LABORDIAGNOSTIKA AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]US2014248618 (SHAIKH KASHAN ALI [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0038] , [0039] , [0047] , [0060] , [0061] , [0084] * * figures 1A,2A,7A,7B,8B,9A * * claims 13,21 * [A] 13-15 | by applicant | US2014124 | US6673620 | DE202011005278U | EP20140152113 |