EP2925107 - A COOLING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/40] | A cooling unit | ||
[2016/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON-WILLIAMS GROUP LIMITED Station Road Edenbridge Kent TN8 6EG / GB | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muir, Jeff 39 Baldslow Road Hastings, TN34 2EZ / GB | 02 /
Didymiotis, Dion 54 Hogarth Crescent London, SW19 2DW / GB | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson Sovereign House 212-224 Shaftesbury Avenue London WC2H 8HQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15020059.0 | 01.04.2010 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | GB20090005870 | 03.04.2009 Original published format: GB 0905870 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2925107 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, F28D15/02 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
H05K7/20827 (EP,US);
F28D15/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2015/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2016/35] | English: | A COOLING UNIT | [2016/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2016/35] |
Former [2015/40] | Kühlvorrichtung | ||
Former [2015/40] | A cooling unit | ||
Former [2015/40] | Appareil de refroidissement | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 19.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10719760.0 / EP2415334 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5725049 (SWANSON THEODORE D [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 5, line 43 - column 9, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO03006910 (THERMAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1298975 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 35 - column 12, line 46; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2006232945 (CHU RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 24 - page 5, paragraph 39; figures 2-9 * |