EP3001935 - DOOR ASSEMBLY AND REFRIGERATING CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schulte Duschkabinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Bogenstrasse 6 59846 Sundern / DE | [2016/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hepfner, Peter Am Schieferbruch 6 58675 Hemer / DE | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | Häckel, Stefan Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2016/14] | Application number, filing date | 15020176.2 | 30.09.2015 | [2016/14] | Priority number, date | DE20142007875U | 02.10.2014 Original published format: DE 202014007875 U | DE20142008032U | 10.10.2014 Original published format: DE 202014008032 U | DE20152002541U | 09.04.2015 Original published format: DE 202015002541 U | [2016/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3001935 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/04, E05D15/06, F25D23/02 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
E05D15/0604 (EP);
E05D15/0621 (EP);
E06B5/006 (EP);
F25D23/02 (EP);
A47F3/043 (EP);
E05D15/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2016/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRANORDNUNG UND KÜHLMÖBEL | [2016/14] | English: | DOOR ASSEMBLY AND REFRIGERATING CABINET | [2016/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE PORTE ET MEUBLE FRIGORIFIQUE | [2016/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 18.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1541800 (WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] , [0016]; figure - * [Y] 3,6,11,12; | [XY]CH561351 (HUEPPE JUSTIN FA) [X] 1 * figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 3,6,11,12; | [A]WO2014037969 (CIANETTI S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure - * | by applicant | US3805450 |